Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Thomé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1573AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
28 Feb 1574Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
15 Mar 1574InstalledBishop of Saint-Malo, France
1586ResignedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
17 Feb 1591DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for François Thomé:
Bishop François Thomé (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 17.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013