Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Saint Sixte

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1557Born
29 Mar 159942.0AppointedBishop of Riez, France
3 Oct 159942.5Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
13 Apr 161356.0DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Saint Sixte
Bishop Charles de Saint Sixte (born , died ) Bishop of Riez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Ordained BishopYvelines, Villepreux
Death PlaceRiez, Diocese of Riez

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Dec 2017