Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Bourbon-Navarre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹Born
26 Mar 159739.2AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
28 Dec 159739.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
1 Dec 160446.9ResignedArchbishop of Rouen, France
15 Jun 161052.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bourbon-Navarre
Archbishop Charles de Bourbon-Navarre (born 1558, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Victor, Abbey, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast