Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Garimberti (Galimbertu)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gallese, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1506Born
17 Mar 156356.6AppointedBishop of Gallese, Italy
1566¹59.4ResignedBishop of Gallese, Italy
28 Nov 157569.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Gallese, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Garimberti (Galimbertu) (VIAF: 56665239)
Bishop Girolamo Garimberti (Galimbertu) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gallese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 8*
  • b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast