Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Beniamino Depalma, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1941 BornGiovinazzo
3 Apr 196523.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 Dec 199049.5AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
26 Jan 199149.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi-Cava de’ Tirreni, Italy
15 Jul 199958.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nola, Italy
16 Oct 199958.4InstalledBishop of Nola, Italy
11 Nov 201675.4RetiredBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Depalma
Archbishop Beniamino Depalma C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nola

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Nola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,440
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Nov 2016