Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciro Fanelli

Bishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1964 Born
15 Sep 199025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lucera-Troia, Italy
4 Aug 201752.8AppointedBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
18 Oct 201753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy
4 Nov 201753.0InstalledBishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ciro Fanelli
Bishop Ciro Fanelli (born ) Bishop of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucera, Diocese of Lucera
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lucera, Diocese of Lucera-Troia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melfi-Rapolla-Venosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 14 Aug 2017
  • c2+: CB, 24 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Oct 2017