Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Migliavacca

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1967 Born
27 Jun 199224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
5 Oct 201548.1AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
9 Dec 201548.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
20 Dec 201548.3InstalledBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Migliavacca
Bishop Andrea Migliavacca (born ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePavia, Diocese of Pavia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Miniato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 10 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 7 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,685

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast