Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosario Gisana

Bishop of Piazza Armerina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1959 BornModica
4 Oct 198627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Noto, Italy
27 Feb 201454.8AppointedBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy
5 Apr 201454.9Ordained BishopBishop of Piazza Armerina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rosario Gisana:
Bishop Rosario Gisana (born ) Bishop of Piazza Armerina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Piazza Armerina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 26 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015