Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo De Nicol˛

Official Emeritus of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

Titular Bishop of Mariana in Corsica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1937 BornCattolica
19 Mar 196023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rimini, Italy
10 Mar 199457.1AppointedOfficial of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
24 May 200871.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mariana in Corsica
12 Jun 200871.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mariana in Corsica
4 Aug 201275.5RetiredOfficial of the Prefecture of the Papal Household

MicroData Summary for Paolo De Nicol˛:
Bishop Paolo De Nicol˛ (born ) Official Emeritus of Prefecture of the Papal Household

Please contact the Bishop through the Prefecture of the Papal Household.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,761
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Mar 2014