Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frédéric Osterrath, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Pietersburg

Titular Bishop of Syedra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1882BornTilff, Belgium
3 Mar 190623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Nov 193957.0AppointedAbbot of Pietersburg, South Africa
14 Nov 193957.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingis
3 Mar 194057.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tingis
Oct 1952³69.9ResignedAbbot of Pietersburg, South Africa
14 Nov 195674.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Syedra
22 Jul 196077.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Pietersburg, South Africa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Frédéric Osterrath:
Bishop Frédéric Osterrath O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Pietersburg

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013