Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornel Damian

Auxiliary Bishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

Titular Bishop of Iziriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1960 BornJibou
22 Jun 198626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
31 Oct 200343.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
31 Oct 200343.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iziriana
8 Dec 200343.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iziriana

MicroData Summary for Cornel Damian:
Bishop Cornel Damian (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bucarest {Bucureşti}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013