Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Áron Márton

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1896Born
6 Jul 192427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
24 Dec 193842.3AppointedBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
12 Feb 193942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
4 Mar 197073.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)
15 Nov 197175.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)
2 Apr 198083.5RetiredBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
29 Sep 198084.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for Áron Márton (VIAF: 50026945)
Bishop Áron Márton (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCsikszentdomokos
Ordained PriestAlba Iulia, Diocese of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen
Ordained BishopSt. Michel, Cathedral, Cluj, Diocese of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian)
Death PlaceAlba Iulia, Diocese of Alba Iulia
Buried Place (Original)Saint Michael, Cathedral, Alba Iulia, Diocese of Alba Iulia

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 6
  • aadm: CB, 6 Dec 2019
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast