Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iosif Păuleţ

Bishop of Iaşi, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1954 Born
29 Jun 197924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
6 Jul 201964.7AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
6 Aug 201964.8Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania

MicroData Summary for Iosif Păuleţ
Bishop Iosif Păuleţ (born ) Bishop of Iaşi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTămăşeni, Diocese of Iaşi
Ordained PriestSfânta Fecioara Mariă, Regină, Cathedral, Iaşi, Diocese of Iaşi
Ordained BishopSfânta Fecioara Mariă, Regină, Cathedral, Iaşi, Diocese of Iaşi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iaşi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Jul 2019
  • c1: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast