Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cipriano García Fernández, O.S.A.

Prelate Emeritus of Cafayate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1931 BornSantibáñez de Tera, Spain
15 Jul 195624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
28 May 199159.4AppointedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
11 Aug 199159.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
26 Jan 200775.0RetiredPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Cipriano García Fernández:
Bishop Cipriano García Fernández O.S.A. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Cafayate

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Cafayate.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,463

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015