Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Anastasio Moreno García, O.S.A.

Prelate Emeritus of Cafayate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1938 BornMilagros, Spain
27 Jul 195819.9ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
27 Jul 196122.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
9 Jul 196425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
17 Nov 200769.2AppointedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
9 Mar 200869.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
10 Feb 201475.4RetiredPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mariano Anastasio Moreno García:
Bishop Mariano Anastasio Moreno García O.S.A. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Cafayate

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Cafayate.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,688
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 10 Feb 2014