Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Gagnon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gaspé, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1941Born
4 Jun 196625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
4 Dec 199857.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
4 Dec 199857.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
19 Mar 199957.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
15 Nov 200261.4AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
17 Jan 200361.6InstalledBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
2 Jul 201675.1RetiredBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
23 Dec 201675.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gaspé, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean Gagnon
Bishop Jean Gagnon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gaspé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Joseph-de-Lauzon
Ordained PriestQuébec, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-de-Québec, Cathedral Basilica, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec
Death PlaceLévis

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,486
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2016
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast