Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Raymond Dumais

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1950Born
26 Jun 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 199343.5AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
20 May 199443.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
21 Jul 200151.1ResignedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
19 Oct 201262.3Died

MicroData Summary for Raymond Dumais (VIAF: 106202423)
(Layman) Raymond Dumais (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmqui

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,321
  • d: CB, 22 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast