Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Kaspar von Franken-Siersdorf

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Rhodiapolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1683³Born
4 Oct 170622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Jul 171228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Jun 172440.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Jun 172440.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
30 Jul 172440.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
6 Feb 177086.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Kaspar von Franken-Siersdorf
Bishop Franz Kaspar von Franken-Siersdorf (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018