Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexius Antonius von Nassau

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1673BornLimburg
14 Nov 169421.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Nov 169522.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 172855.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
7 Nov 172855.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus

MicroData Summary for Alexius Antonius von Nassau:
Archbishop Alexius Antonius von Nassau (born ) Titular Archbishop of Trapezus

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015