Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Max Friedrich von Königsegg und Rothenfels

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1708BornKöln
28 Mar 175647.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 176152.8SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
13 Jul 176153.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Aug 176153.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Sep 176254.3SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
20 Dec 176254.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
15 Apr 178475.9DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Max Friedrich von Königsegg und Rothenfels:
Archbishop Max Friedrich von Königsegg und Rothenfels (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 173, and Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015