Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Antoine de Robiano

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1698Born
23 Dec 172426.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 May 172526.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 174546.8SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
28 Mar 174647.6ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
12 Jun 174647.8Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
13 Jun 174647.8InstalledBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
28 May 176970.7DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jean Antoine de Robiano
Bishop Jean Antoine de Robiano (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruselles

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,746, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast