Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Forzoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Massa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1912Born
29 Jun 193926.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fiesole, Italy
31 May 194027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Fiesole, Italy
14 May 195340.7AppointedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
9 Aug 195340.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
12 Sep 195341.0InstalledBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
30 Nov 196149.2AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
6 Jan 196249.3InstalledBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
23 Apr 197057.6AppointedBishop of Apuania, Italy
20 Jun 197057.8InstalledBishop of Apuania, Italy
23 Feb 198875.5RetiredBishop of Massa, Italy
7 Dec 199179.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Massa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aldo Forzoni
Bishop Aldo Forzoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Massa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevarchi, Diocese of Fiesole
Ordained BishopCollegiata di San Lorenzo, Montevarchi, Diocese of Fiesole
Death PlaceHospital, Massa, Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Crypt, Massa, Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • od/i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast