Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Borghetti

Bishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1954 Born
17 Oct 198228.5Ordained PriestPriest of Apuania, Italy
25 Jun 201056.2AppointedBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
15 Sep 201056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
26 Sep 201056.5InstalledBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
19 Nov 201258.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Grosseto, Italy
10 Aug 201359.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Grosseto, Italy
10 Jan 201560.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
25 Mar 201561.0InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
1 Sep 201662.4SucceededBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Borghetti
Bishop Guglielmo Borghetti (born ) Bishop of Albenga-Imperia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvenza di Carrara
Ordained PriestCattedrale di Massa, Massa, Diocese of Apuania
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Massa, Diocese of Massa Carrara-Pontremoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albenga-Imperia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,790
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2015
  • s: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast