Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Soane Lilo Foliaki, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1933Born
21 Jul 195522.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
10 Jun 199461.1AppointedBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
23 Jun 199461.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
18 Apr 200875.0RetiredBishop of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)
24 Dec 201380.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tonga, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Soane Lilo Foliaki
Bishop Soane Lilo Foliaki S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMa'ufanga

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,347
  • d: CB, 27 Dec 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast