Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ermenegildo Cardinal Florit

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1901Born
11 Apr 192523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
12 Jul 195453.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
12 Jul 195453.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
12 Sep 195453.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
9 Mar 196260.6SucceededArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
22 Feb 196563.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196563.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Regina Apostolorum
3 Jun 197775.9RetiredArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
8 Dec 198584.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ermenegildo Florit
Ermenegildo Cardinal Florit (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Firenze {Florence}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFagagna

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast