Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Pizzoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1902BornOrsaria
28 Jun 192523.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 195148.7AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
27 May 195148.9Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
6 Sep 196664.2ResignedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
6 Sep 196664.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gunugus
6 Sep 196664.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy
21 Mar 197471.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
31 May 198582.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy
1 Aug 198583.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Iulium Carnicum
5 Apr 199491.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Pizzoni:
Bishop Emilio Pizzoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013