Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Maria Casalini, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manzini, Swaziland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1915Born
19 Jun 193822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
18 Dec 196550.0AppointedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
12 Feb 196650.1Ordained BishopBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
24 Jan 197660.1ResignedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
28 Aug 198266.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Manzini, Swaziland

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Maria Casalini
Bishop Girolamo Maria Casalini O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manzini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast