Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwig Philipp Schaefer

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae

Apostolic Administrator of Mei▀en (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1853BornDingelstńdt, Germany
6 Sep 187623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
4 Apr 190652.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany
4 Apr 190652.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
4 Apr 190652.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mei▀en (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
16 May 190653.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
5 Sep 191461.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony), Germany

MicroData Summary for Ludwig Philipp Schaefer:
Bishop Ludwig Philipp Schaefer (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saxonia (Saxony)

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1906, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013