Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franšois-Louis (Franz Ludwig) Fleck

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1824Born
17 Jun 184824.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 188056.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
13 May 188157.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
13 May 188157.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
25 Jul 188157.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
18 Aug 188662.5SucceededBishop of Metz, France
28 Oct 189975.7DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Franšois-Louis (Franz Ludwig) Fleck (VIAF: 308221055)
Bishop Franšois-Louis (Franz Ludwig) Fleck (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiederbronn
Ordained BishopS. Vincent, Metz, Diocese of Metz

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 381, and Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1881, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017