Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulises Aurelio Casiano Vargas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1933Born
30 May 196733.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 197642.4AppointedBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
30 Apr 197642.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
6 Jul 201177.7RetiredBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
5 Aug 201884.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Ulises Aurelio Casiano Vargas
Bishop Ulises Aurelio Casiano Vargas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mayagüez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLajas
Death PlaceSan Germán, Diocese of Mayagüez

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 5 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast