Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ondo

Dioecesis Ondoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 April 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ibadan
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 15,518 (5,993 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://ondodiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 46, Akure, Ondo State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (034)241.263
  • Fax: 241.393

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ondo-Ilorin
12 January 1943ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Vicariate Apostolic of Ondo-Ilorin (erected)
Diocese of Ondo
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ondo-Ilorin Diocese of Ondo
20 January 1960Territory LostDiocese of Ondo Prefecture Apostolic of Ilorin (erected)
30 July 1972Territory LostDiocese of Ondo Diocese of Ado-Ekiti (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ondo
1970100,3162,836,4663.5%731382,6394241ap1971
198072,0001,717,0004.2%514193,789243512ap1981
1990112,0002,256,0005.0%1515303,733294018ap1991
1999190,2003,265,4505.8%3213454,226235231ap2000
2000193,4303,385,9905.7%3312454,298256033ap2001
2001196,8003,509,7005.6%4012523,784246233ap2002
2002197,7503,520,0305.6%3413474,207275834ap2003
2003198,3433,530,5905.6%3413474,220306043ap2004
2004198,7223,674,6925.4%4315583,426366345ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013