Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Patrick Olatunji Fagun

Bishop Emeritus of Ekiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1935 BornAkure
4 Jul 196530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ondo, Nigeria
28 Jun 197136.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ondo, Nigeria
28 Jun 197136.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
10 Oct 197136.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
30 Jul 197237.2AppointedBishop of Ekiti, Nigeria
17 Apr 201075.0RetiredBishop of Ekiti, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Michael Patrick Olatunji Fagun:
Bishop Michael Patrick Olatunji Fagun (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ekiti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ekiti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015