Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nepote-Fus, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima

Titular Bishop of Helos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1893BornMathe Canarese, Italy
18 Dec 192027.6Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
16 Sep 193643.4AppointedPrefect of Meru, Kenya
7 Aug 194855.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rio Branco, Brazil
18 Apr 195259.0AppointedPrelate of Rio Branco, Brazil
18 Apr 195259.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Helos
6 Jul 195259.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helos
Dec 1965³72.6ResignedPrelate of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
9 Aug 196673.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Nepote-Fus:
Bishop José Nepote-Fus I.M.C. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Roraima

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013