Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Fernández Feo-Tinoco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1908BornCaracas
25 Oct 193123.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 195243.6AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
24 Aug 195244.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
26 Oct 198476.1RetiredBishop of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
17 Sep 198779.0DiedBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Fernández Feo-Tinoco:
Bishop Alejandro Fernández Feo-Tinoco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013