Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano José Parra León

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cumaná, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1911Born
23 Sep 193322.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 196655.2AppointedBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
22 Jan 196755.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
18 Feb 196755.5InstalledBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
12 Mar 198775.5RetiredBishop of Cumaná, Venezuela
26 Jan 198977.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cumaná, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Mariano José Parra León
Bishop Mariano José Parra León (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cumaná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Puertos de Altagracia

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast