Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Arellano Durán

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1927BornColon
1 Nov 195528.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Carlos de Venezuela
3 Jun 198053.0AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
24 Aug 198053.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
6 Sep 198053.2InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
27 Dec 200275.5RetiredBishop of San Carlos de Venezuela
2 Mar 200375.7DiedBishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Antonio Arellano Durán:
Bishop Antonio Arellano Durán (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Carlos de Venezuela

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013