Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Castielli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucera-Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1927Born
9 Jul 195023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lucera, Italy
30 Sep 198659.5IncardinatedPriest of Lucera, Italy
11 Feb 198759.9AppointedBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
25 Mar 198760.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
18 May 199669.2ResignedBishop of Lucera-Troia, Italy
3 Aug 201891.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucera-Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Castielli
Bishop Raffaele Castielli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucera-Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaeto
Death PlaceLucera, Diocese of Lucera-Troia

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast