Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Femi Ajakaye

Bishop of Ekiti, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1962 Born
4 Jul 198725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ekiti, Nigeria
16 Apr 200845.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ekiti, Nigeria
12 Jul 200846.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ekiti, Nigeria
17 Apr 201047.8SucceededBishop of Ekiti, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Felix Femi Ajakaye
Bishop Felix Femi Ajakaye (born ) Bishop of Ekiti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbadan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ekiti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,930
  • s: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast