Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Barbado y Viejo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1890BornLa Cortina
25 Jul 191323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 May 193544.9AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
29 Jun 193545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Apr 194251.8AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
29 Apr 196473.9DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Barbado y Viejo:
Bishop Francisco Barbado y Viejo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013