Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Eguiguren Galarraga, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of El Beni o Beni

Titular Bishop of Salapia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1930BornGoyaz, Spain
13 Mar 195424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Nov 198151.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
30 Nov 198151.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Salapia
18 Apr 198252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salapia
6 Jun 200777.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
15 Jul 201282.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Manuel Eguiguren Galarraga:
Bishop Manuel Eguiguren Galarraga O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of El Beni o Beni

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2007
  • d: CB, 17 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013