Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Cunningham

Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1943 Born
24 May 196925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
9 Mar 200460.7AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
18 May 200460.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
21 Apr 200965.8AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
26 May 200965.9InstalledBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
21 Sep 201269.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rochester, New York, USA
3 Jan 201470.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Cunningham
Bishop Robert Joseph Cunningham (born ) Bishop of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Syracuse.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,596
  • aadm/roch: Website of the Diocese, 21 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018