Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Marie Hubert Antoine Jean Roland du Noday, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1899Born
4 Aug 192828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Mar 193636.3AppointedBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
1 May 193636.4Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
5 May 197676.5RetiredBishop of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil
14 Dec 198586.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto Nacional, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alain Marie Hubert Antoine Jean Roland du Noday
Bishop Alain Marie Hubert Antoine Jean Roland du Noday O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto Nacional

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Servant, France

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast