Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Duperrier-Dumourier

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1746BornLe Mans
1771¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 182376.3SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
10 Mar 182376.5ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
4 May 182376.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
17 Apr 182780.6DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Duperrier-Dumourier:
Bishop Charles-François Duperrier-Dumourier (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013