Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasile Louis Puscas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1915BornAurora, IL
14 May 194226.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 198267.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA
4 Dec 198267.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
26 Jun 198367.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
26 Mar 198771.5AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA
2 Jul 199377.8RetiredBishop of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA
3 Oct 200994.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA

MicroData Summary for Vasile Louis Puscas:
Bishop Vasile Louis Puscas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint George’s in Canton

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013