Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Judson Michael Procyk

Deceased

Archbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1931Born
19 May 195726.1Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
9 Nov 199463.5AppointedArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
7 Feb 199563.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
24 Apr 200170.0DiedArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Judson Michael Procyk
(WikiData: Q16015252)
Archbishop Judson Michael Procyk (born , died ) Archbishop of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUniontown, PA, Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestGrounds of, Saints Cyril and Methodius, Seminary, Pittsburgh, Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Munhall, Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,486
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 21 Oct 2020
  • op.loc: CB, 26 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 6 Dec 2022