Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Dubois

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1754BornArgentolles
18 Sep 177925.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 182065.5SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
29 May 182065.8ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
9 Jul 182065.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
6 Jan 182267.4DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Dubois:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Dubois (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013