Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc-Marie de Bombelles

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1744Born
14 Aug 180358.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181772.9SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
1 Oct 181772.9ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
3 Oct 181974.9Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
5 Mar 182277.4DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Marc-Marie de Bombelles
Bishop Marc-Marie de Bombelles (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBitche

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast