Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Charles du Plessis d’Argentré

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1723BornArgentré
3 Sep 175835.2SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
18 Dec 175835.5ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
14 Jan 175935.5Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
28 Mar 180884.7DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Charles du Plessis d’Argentré:
Bishop Louis-Charles du Plessis d’Argentré (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015