Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernard Francis Meyer (Mayer), M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Wuchow [Wuzhou], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1891Born
1914²22.5ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
12 Feb 191624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
30 Oct 193140.3AppointedSuperior of Wuchow [Wuzhou], China
10 Dec 193443.4AppointedPrefect of Wuchow [Wuzhou], China
20 Jul 193948.0ResignedPrefect of Wuchow [Wuzhou], China
8 May 197684.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Wuchow [Wuzhou], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Francis Meyer (Mayer)
Father Bernard Francis Meyer (Mayer) M.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Wuchow [Wuzhou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, IA, Diocese of Davenport, Iowa, USA
Death PlaceMaryknoll

  • a priest for 60.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast