Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Gilberto de Moura

Bishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1963 Born
10 Dec 199532.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Jul 201349.6AppointedBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
6 Sep 201349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
29 Sep 201349.8InstalledBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Gilberto de Moura
Bishop João Gilberto de Moura (born ) Bishop of Jardim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItuiutaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jardim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 4 Aug 2013
  • c2+: CB, 5 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast